MD SB413 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain regulations to include a requirement that any swab, slide, or other DNA collection item included in a certain sexual assault evidence collection kit be tested within 1 year after the item was collected.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Testing Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Criminal Law - Procedure
Evidence
Public Safety
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Evidence
Public Safety
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation