MD SB413 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that specified law enforcement officers record specified information pertaining to traffic stops; requiring specified law enforcement agencies to report specified information to the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center; requiring the Police Training Commission to develop a specified format and guidelines and a standardized format for the reporting of specified data; requiring the Police Training Commission to develop a specified model policy; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-17) (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-17) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-10) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {558376/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {558376/1 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Discrimination
Ethnic Affairs
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Police Training Commission
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Discrimination
Ethnic Affairs
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Police Training Commission
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous