MD SB413 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions of law relating to individuals required to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring an adult known to be residing in an informal child care provider's home to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring specified informal child care providers to obtain a criminal history records check; etc.
Title
Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2013-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {928671/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Child Care
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Family Law
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Family Law
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records