MD SB412 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study certain matters, collect certain data, and make certain recommendations; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Child Abuse and Neglect
Children
Committees and Commissions
Foster Care
Human Services, Department of
Murder
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Abuse and Neglect
Children
Committees and Commissions
Foster Care
Human Services, Department of
Murder
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment