MD SB411 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an account holder of the Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan to be at least 18 years old to qualify for the State matching contribution for applications filed on or after January 1, 2022.
Title
Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan – State Matching Contribution – Age of Account Holder
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 493 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB444 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 19A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19A-04.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |