MD SB411 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for an individual who serves as a preceptor in specified preceptorship programs under specified circumstances and works in specified areas of the State with health care workforce shortages; establishing the Nurse Practitioner Preceptorship Tax Credit Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund is to offset the costs of the specified tax credit; requiring the State Board of Nursing to assess a $15 fee for the renewal of a specified certification; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {475760/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {499536/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Education
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Income Tax
Job Training
Nurses
Physicians
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Students
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Income Tax
Job Training
Nurses
Physicians
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Students
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment