MD SB41 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of certain vehicle height monitoring systems in Baltimore County to enforce certain State and local laws restricting the presence of certain vehicles during certain times; and applying to Baltimore County certain provisions of law relating to vehicle height monitoring systems; establishing, prior to the installation height monitoring systems, a workgroup to assist in the evaluation of existing truck routes, the identification of areas for vehicle height monitoring enforcement, and the evaluation of existing signage; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-6) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-10) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {708770/1 Adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB50 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Citations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Counties - Local Laws
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Industry and Technology
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Liability
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
News Media
Notices
Registration
Signs and Billboards
Trials
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Citations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Counties - Local Laws
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Industry and Technology
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Liability
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
News Media
Notices
Registration
Signs and Billboards
Trials
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 24 | 111.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |