MD SB41 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct an audit of the Baltimore Police Department to evaluate the effectiveness and efficiency of the financial management practices of the Department beginning July 1, 2020, and at least once every 6 years thereafter; and requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to provide information regarding the audit process to the Baltimore Police Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore Police Department

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-18SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-15SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-10-09SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback