MD SB407 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Complete Streets Program to provide matching grants to certified jurisdictions to promote healthy communities; providing for program funds to be provided by the Governor in the State budget; specifying the requirements for a local government to be designated as a certified jurisdiction; authorizing a certified jurisdiction to apply for matching grants from the Program; requiring the Department of Transportation to issue a report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-16) (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 722
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (115-16)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {450213/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {327174/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-14SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09SenateHearing canceled
2018-02-14SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0407&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0407f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0407t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0407e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_722_sb0407e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0407_32717401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0407_45021301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0407.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0407_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0646.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0407_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1267.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1390.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback