MD SB407 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-01 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-01 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing procedures for the election and appointment of the members of the Baltimore County Board of Education; repealing provisions governing the appointment of members of the county board; establishing the composition of the county board; requiring members of the county board to reside in, be a registered voter in, and be elected from specified districts; providing for a student member of the county board; providing for the removal of, and hearings and appeal procedures, for specified members of the county board; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {973427/1 Rejected (Y: 4 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {663221/2 Rejected (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {543925/1 Rejected (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Jones V) Rejected (Y: 3 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {973427/1 Rejected (Y: 4 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {663221/2 Rejected (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {543925/1 Rejected (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Jones V) Rejected (Y: 3 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-01 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (36-5) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) 973427/1 Rejected (4-39) | |
2012-03-30 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) 663221/2 Rejected (10-30) | |
2012-03-30 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) 543925/1 Rejected (16-28) | |
2012-03-30 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) 183825/1 Rejected | |
2012-03-30 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) 953420/1 Rejected | |
2012-03-30 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) 113523/2 Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Rejected (3-36) | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 704930/1 | |
2012-03-30 | Special Order until later today (Senator Kelley) Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 704930/1 | |
2012-03-29 | Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Kelley) Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 704930/1 | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/15 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Ballots
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
County Executives
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Elections
Hearings
Judicial Review
Local Government Mandates
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Reports
Salaries
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
County Executives
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Elections
Hearings
Judicial Review
Local Government Mandates
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Reports
Salaries
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students