MD SB404 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the sales and use tax the sale of home wheelchair lifts and stairlifts; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |