MD SB402 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which a facility operated by the Maryland Department of Health is required to receive and evaluate an inmate in a correctional facility who has been certified for involuntary admission; authorizing a court, if the Department fails to admit an inmate to a designated State facility within 8 days of a certain notification, to impose any sanction reasonably designed to compel compliance with the Act; requiring a certain report to be submitted yearly to certain legislative committees by October 31; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (35-11)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {307079/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback