MD SB401 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the annual deadline from June 30 to October 30 by which a license holder must present the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City a certain certificate regarding certain property taxes.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Suspension Based on Unpaid Personal Property Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74 |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment {933124/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
License Commissioners, Boards of
Personal Property
Property Tax
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
License Commissioners, Boards of
Personal Property
Property Tax