MD SB401 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that any new or replacement piping that is buried or installed for the purpose of connecting a building to a water supply system or sewerage system be buried or installed with an insulated copper tracer wire that is suitable for direct burial and has an American wire gauge (AWG) of at least 10, or an equivalent product that makes the piping detectable; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable Wires
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {663695/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {557370/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |