MD SB400 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland corporate income tax for specified dividends included in federal taxable income as a result of a specified repatriation holiday enacted by federal legislation; requiring the Comptroller to provide for the administration of the Act if specified federal legislation is enacted; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |