MD SB4 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the General Assembly may authorize, by law, the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to issue certain sports and event wagering licenses; requiring certain implementing legislation to include certain criteria; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that certain revenues be used to fund public education; requiring certain State entities to contract with an appropriate expert to review a certain disparity study for certain purposes; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Patterson) Adopted (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
2020-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (129-3)
2020-03-17HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Patterson) Adopted (125-2)
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {395168/1 Adopted
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-10HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-10HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-06SenateFloor Amendment {533523/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
2020-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {489239/1 Adopted
2020-03-05SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2020-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {489239/1
2020-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-01-20SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects

Accountants
Advertising
Age of Majority
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Communications
Community Development
Comptroller
Construction
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Electronic Communication
Equipment
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Forms
Gaming
Highways
Identification
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Mobile Devices
Notices
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Privacy
Procurement
Racing
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signatures
Small Business
Sports and Recreation
Stadiums
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Victims
Video
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government91A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-03(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-30(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-33(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E10(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E11(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E12(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E13(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E14(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E2(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E3(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E4(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E5(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E6(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E7(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E8(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback