MD SB4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for materials, parts, or equipment used to repair, maintain, or upgrade aircraft or the avionics systems of aircraft if the materials, parts, or equipment are installed on the aircraft; requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly by December 31 each year on the amount of sales and use tax revenue lost from the exemption and any change to the number of aviation technicians employed in the State as a result of the exemption; terminating the Act after June 30, 2024; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-07SenateHearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
2019-01-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-03SenateHearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-11-20SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback