MD SB4 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of trustees of the Maryland Environmental Trust from 15 to 19 members; increasing to 16 the number of trustees elected to the Trust beginning on June 1, 2017; requiring that four of the trustees be elected each year for a term of four years at a specified meeting by a majority vote of the trustees present; requiring that four trustees be elected in October 2016; specifying that recommendations for elected trustees reflect a range of professions, and geographies, diversity, and specified experience; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Environmental Trust - Trustees
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {650111/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |