MD SB4 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - Hearing 2/2 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - Hearing 2/2 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making provisions that authorize eligible veterans' organizations to own or operate slot machines applicable statewide; and altering the definition of "eligible organization".
Title
Gaming - Slot Machines - Ownership and Operation by Eligible War Veterans'
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-20 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2009-11-03 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0004.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0004f.pdf |