MD SB398 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program to foster job creation and economic development in the State by promoting the commercialization of research, facilitating the transfer of certain technology, and encouraging small businesses to apply for certain grants; establishing qualifications for participation in the Program; authorizing the Program to provide certain awards and investments to certain businesses, subject to certain limitations; etc.
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Katie Hester [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB514 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Capital Budgets
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Economic and Community Development
Federal Government
Grants
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Medical Research
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Time
Treasurers
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Economic and Community Development
Federal Government
Grants
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Medical Research
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Time
Treasurers
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 496 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |