MD SB398 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a pilot program on community solar energy generating systems under the authority of the Public Service Commission; providing for the structure and operation of the program, including the generation of electricity and allocation of costs to subscribers to the community solar energy generating system; requiring the Commission to limit the program so that the Commission may conduct a meaningful study of the program's results; requiring the Commission to adopt specified regulations on or before May 15, 2016; etc.
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (122-17) (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (122-17) (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (122-17) |
2015-04-09 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {823690/1 Adopted |
2015-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {493293/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {767070/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {767070/1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Energy Matters
Equipment
Notices
Petitions
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Energy Matters
Equipment
Notices
Petitions
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation