MD SB397 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a presumption that a garnishment against specified property held jointly by spouses in specified financial institutions is valid unless, within 30 days after service of the writ of garnishment on the garnishee, either spouse files a motion objecting to the garnishment and serves a copy of the motion on the judgment creditor, the garnishee, and any other person named on the account; and altering specified terminology.
Title
Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-6) (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-6) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attachments and Garnishments
Banks and Trust Companies
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Credit Unions
Savings and Loan Associations
Banks and Trust Companies
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Credit Unions
Savings and Loan Associations