MD SB396 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing hours of sale for a holder of a Class B-D-7 beer, wine, and liquor license from 9 a.m. to 9 p.m. along the north side of Frederick Avenue between South Augusta Avenue and South Loudon Avenue in Baltimore City.
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Hours of Sale
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2021-04-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {883795/1 Adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {883795/1 |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB256 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |