MD SB395 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the type of position of specified personnel in the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission; establishing specified personnel positions in the Commission as contractual positions; and establishing that the Director of the Commission is the immediate supervisor of the General Counsel, Treasurer or Chief Financial Officer, Chief Engineer, and any other department director.
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Engineers
Public Local Laws
St. Mary's County
Treasurers
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties - Local Laws
Engineers
Public Local Laws
St. Mary's County
Treasurers
Work, Labor and Employment