MD SB394 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain emergency medical services providers to offer opioid overdose reversal drugs approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration to individuals who received treatment for a nonfatal drug overdose or were evaluated by a crisis evaluation team; requiring certain community services programs, certain private and public entities, and hospitals to have a protocol to offer overdose reversal drugs free of charge to certain individuals under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {733920/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {223422/1 Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {223422/1 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {223422/1 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB408 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Examinations
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Opioids
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Substance Abuse
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Examinations
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Opioids
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Substance Abuse
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 13 | 516 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 310.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 8 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |