MD SB394 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to provide, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling located in Baltimore City that is owned by a public safety officer employed by the Baltimore City Public School System; and applying the Act to taxable years after June 30, 2018.
Title
Baltimore City – Property Tax Credit – School Public Safety Officers
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |