MD SB39 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-14 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-14 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Returning to State Meat Processing Inspection; and requiring the Task Force to report to the Secretary of Agriculture by December 1, 2023, its recommendations on implementing State meat processing inspection and to advise the Secretary on the adoption of certain rules and regulations related to meat processing inspection and the establishment of production standards.
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Returning to State Meat Processing Inspection (Farms Buy Local Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Inspections
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Inspections
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0039?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0039f.pdf |