MD SB39 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Police Commissioner of Baltimore City, following each decennial census of the United States, to prepare a plan for the adjustment of the geographic boundaries and composition of each Baltimore City police district and the reallocation of the resources and personnel of the Baltimore City Police Department among the districts based on census population and housing data; requiring the Commissioner to present the plan to the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City within 1 year of the issuance of the census data; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {868270/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-10-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Census
Counties - Local Laws
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Public Local Laws
Public Officials
Public Safety
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Census
Counties - Local Laws
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Public Local Laws
Public Officials
Public Safety
Reapportionment and Redistricting