MD SB39 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a disability parking placard issued by the Motor Vehicle Administration to a permanently disabled individual is valid until the death of the placard holder; establishing certain procedures the Administration must follow on the death of a permanently disabled individual who holds a placard; and authorizing the Administration to issue temporary disability parking placards to certain nonresidents of the State under certain circumstances.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking Placards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Death
Disabilities
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Parking
Residency
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Disabilities
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Parking
Residency
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration