MD SB39 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available a specially designed vintage reproduction registration plate; prescribing who may apply for and the classes of vehicles eligible for the registration plate; providing the manner in which fees will be established, collected, and distributed in connection with the registration plate; requiring that the registration plate be available for a specified time and resemble a specified registration plate issued by the State; and providing for a delayed effective date.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration Plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2012-07-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Counties
Fees
Highways
Historical Matters
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Fees
Highways
Historical Matters
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration