MD SB387 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, dental plan organizations, fraternal benefit organizations, managed care organizations, and certain other persons to be subject to a certain 2.75% assessment in calendar year 2019; establishing that the purpose of the assessment is to recoup a certain aggregate amount of the health insurance provider fee for certain purposes; requiring distribution of the assessment to the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-4) (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-48) (Y: 91 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38
2018-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (42-4)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (90-48)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {846482/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (42-5)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {727070/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {727070/1
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-21SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0387&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0387f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0387t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0387e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_38_sb0387e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0387_72707001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0387_84648201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0387.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0387_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0694.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0387_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1075.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1135.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback