MD SB387 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the statute of limitations for the crime of solicitation to commit murder in the first degree, murder in the second degree, arson in the first degree, or arson in the second degree.
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {838279/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |