MD SB384 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from 15,500 to 31,000 gallons the annual amount of the products manufactured under a Class 9 limited distillery license that the holder of the license may sell at retail on a certain premises for on-sale or off-sale consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License - Retail Sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 326
2018-03-27SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2018-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-23HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-02SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-02-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {704739/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-27SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback