MD SB381 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring applicants to the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to submit to a criminal history records check as a condition of licensure or registration; requiring the Boards to consider specified factors in determining whether to grant a license or registration on receipt of the criminal history record information; prohibiting the Boards from issuing a license or registration if the criminal history record information has not been received; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks Required
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Chiropractors
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Fees
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Licenses
Massage
Physical Therapists
Privacy
Registration
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Fees
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Licenses
Massage
Physical Therapists
Privacy
Registration