MD SB38 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB230
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to access electronically from the Maryland Department of Health a copy of a birth certificate; authorizing the Administration to provide a copy of a birth certificate to a certain person under certain circumstances; authorizing the Administration to set and collect a fee for processing and issuing a birth certificate or for a certain report; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (7-38) (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (7-38) (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Lam) Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (7-38) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {637173/1 Report Adopted |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB38 (Carry Over) 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Subjects
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Fees
Health, Department of
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Public Health
Reports
Vital Records
Federal Government
Fees
Health, Department of
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Public Health
Reports
Vital Records