MD SB375 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue a hotel lobby license; authorizing a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption in accordance with certain requirements; establishing that a license holder may sell beer, wine, and liquor on Monday through Saturday from noon to 10 p.m. and on Sunday from 11 a.m. to 10 p.m.; prohibiting a license holder from selling beer, wine, and liquor through a vending machine; establishing an annual license fee of $1,250; etc.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 351 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB864 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 350
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Commerce and Business
Fees
Harford County
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Commerce and Business
Fees
Harford County
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1004.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |