MD SB375 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain service contracts entered into by the State contain a certain work verification clause; requiring the work verification clause to require the contractor to use certain work verification software for a certain purpose, specify that the State is liable only for the cost of certain work that is verified in a certain manner, specify the requirements of the work verification software, and require that certain data be stored for at least 7 years and be provided to the State without cost under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Service Contracts - Work Verification Clause
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Archives
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Identification
Industry and Technology
Liability
Photography
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Recordings
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Identification
Industry and Technology
Liability
Photography
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Recordings
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment