MD SB375 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring insurance producers who sell, solicit, or negotiate bail bonds to receive continuing education that directly relates to bail bond insurance.
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-3) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-3) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Finance |