MD SB375 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "credit services business" for purposes of the Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act to exclude a person licensed by the State as an associate real estate broker or a real estate salesperson.
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - Scope
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2013-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {697272/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Credit
Licenses
Real Estate
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Credit
Licenses
Real Estate