MD SB374 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting legislators and persons acting on behalf of legislators from receiving, depositing, or using a certain contribution, conducting a fund-raising event, or selling or soliciting a ticket to a fundraising event during a special session of the General Assembly except under certain circumstances; and prohibiting legislators from intentionally scheduling a fund-raising event that coincides with a special session of the General Assembly once the special session has been announced.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Public Ethics Law - Special Session of the General Assembly - Contributions Prohibited

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-16HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {974739/1 Adopted
2021-03-05SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2021-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {974739/1
2021-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-19SenateHearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions5514.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback