MD SB374 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 831
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 831
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $20,000 to $60,000 the salary of an attorney employed by the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County; authorizing the Board to hire an attorney on a contractual basis to perform work that the attorney employed by the Board is unable to perform because of a conflict of interest; and prohibiting the Board from spending more than $30,000 each year to hire a contractual attorney.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-48) (Y: 91 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 831 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-48) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
Attorneys
License Commissioners, Boards of
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
Attorneys
License Commissioners, Boards of
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment