MD SB372 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a disciplinary panel to obtain a third peer review report from a certain source or dismiss certain complaints against licensed physicians if only one of the two peer review reports makes a certain finding that a certain violation did not occur; requiring the State Board of Physicians to expunge all records of a public reprimand or probation 3 years after the final disposition of the case; providing certain insurers may not take any adverse actions under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physicians - Discipline - Procedures and Effects

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2019-02-24SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback