MD SB372 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from certain real property recordation, transfer, and excise taxes and fees transfers of real property and certain vehicles from a revocable trust to a beneficiary of the trust as a result of the death of the settlor of the revocable trust.
Title
Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {599231/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reassigned to Budget and Taxation |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Beneficiaries
Death
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Motor Vehicles
Real Property
Recordation
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Death
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Motor Vehicles
Real Property
Recordation
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax