MD SB372 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a specified prohibition on requiring an employee or a prospective employee to take a polygraph examination or similar test as a condition of prospective or continued employment does not apply to an individual employed as a correctional officer or in any other capacity that involves direct personal contact with an inmate in the Carroll County Detention Center.
Title
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Carroll County
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Lie Detection
Prisoners
Public Safety
Work, Labor and Employment
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Lie Detection
Prisoners
Public Safety
Work, Labor and Employment