MD SB372 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified notice provisions by requiring a holder of a certificate of sale to send specified notices by certified mail before the holder of a certificate of sale may file a complaint to foreclose the right of redemption; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Notice to Foreclose Right of Redemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (137-1) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |