MD SB37 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Decreasing the State corporate income tax rate from 8.25% to 8.0% for tax year 2019, 7.5% for tax year 2020, and 7.0% for tax year 2021 and beyond.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-14SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-07SenateHearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
2019-01-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-03SenateHearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-11-16SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback