MD SB37 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year in carrying on a trade or business as a certain medical cannabis grower, processor, or dispensary; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, or Dispensary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |