MD SB37 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law establishing the Maryland Drug and Alcohol Grants Program Fund; repealing the authorization for the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to establish specified grant programs; repealing specified provisions of law establishing the Law Enforcement Equipment fund; etc.
Title
Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-09-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Equipment
Genetics
Grants
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse
Criminal Law - Procedure
Equipment
Genetics
Grants
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse