MD SB37 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the sanitary district in Dorchester County to charge a specified late fee for unpaid water and sewer usage charges; authorizing the sanitary commission in Dorchester County to require the payment of specified late fees before reconnecting with water service; and providing that when a specified charge is in default it will accrue interest from a specified date and at a specified rate.
Title
Dorchester County - Water and Sewer Service - Late Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-01-31 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-01-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-01-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-01-26 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-04 | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-10-24 | Pre-filed |