MD SB365 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy; requiring the Task Force to review, study, and develop findings and recommendations regarding forest conservation in Maryland; authorizing the Task Force to consult with the Chesapeake Bay Program and other entities to gather information about data, models, and policies useful to carrying out its mission; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {254131/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Exemptions
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Utilities
Conservation
Exemptions
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Utilities